EP3550551 - DISPLAY PANEL AND PHOTOELECTRIC DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chaoxi c/o Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, NO. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Grunert, Marcus Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18248067.3 | 27.12.2018 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | CN201810308223 | 08.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810308223 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3550551 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3550551 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3208 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G09G3/3208 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/00 (RU);
H10K59/60 (KR,US);
G09G3/006 (CN);
H10K59/13 (US);
G01J1/4204 (KR);
G01J1/4228 (KR);
G09G5/02 (RU);
H04M1/0266 (KR);
H10K50/86 (US);
H10K59/8791 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
G09G2300/0465 (EP,US);
G09G2360/144 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2003 (US);
G09G3/3406 (US);
G09G3/3413 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND FOTOELEKTRISCHES ERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/41] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND PHOTOELECTRIC DETECTION METHOD | [2019/41] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 04.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004263670 (YAMASAKI RYO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0072] - [0087] - [ 145] - [0157]; figures 3,4,6,7,8,17-20 * [I] 3; | [XI]WO2018023722 (SHANGHAI OXI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 3,4,5,6 *[I] 3 |