EP3521824 - METHOD OF INCREASING READING BARCODE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyson Bioresearch, Inc. 5F, No. 22, Kedong Road III Science Park Chunan Town Miaoli Hsien 35053 / TW | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, ANDREW YI 5F, No. 22, Kedong 3rd Rd., Zhunan Science Park 350 Miaoli County / TW | 02 /
Chang, Chih-Ching 5F, No. 22, Kedong 3rd Rd., Zhunan Science Park 350 Miaoli County / TW | 03 /
Liu, Jen-Hao 5F, No. 22, Kedong 3rd Rd., Zhunan Science Park 350 Miaoli County / TW | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18248164.8 | 28.12.2018 | [2019/32] | Priority number, date | US201862624810P | 01.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862624810 P | US201816211205 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: US201816211205 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3521824 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3521824 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
A61B5/150786 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/1495 (US);
A61B5/150022 (US);
A61B5/150358 (US);
A61B5/157 (US);
A61B90/96 (US);
G01N33/66 (CN);
G06K17/00 (CN);
G06K7/1473 (CN);
G16H40/20 (CN);
A61B2562/0295 (US);
A61B2562/08 (US);
A61B2562/226 (US);
A61B2562/227 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEIGERUNG DES LESENS VON BARCODE-INFORMATIONEN | [2019/32] | English: | METHOD OF INCREASING READING BARCODE INFORMATION | [2019/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LECTURE D'INFORMATIONS DE CODE À BARRES | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS62209684 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2010041571 (COHEN MARC H [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0034] *; | [I]US2010119414 (EISENHARDT CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]WO2015134779 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0041] * | by applicant | TWM399102U | TW201329451 | TWM482562U |