EP3598178 - PORTABLE POSITIONING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING A GEOSPATIAL POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trimble Nantes S.A.S. Headquarter Rue Th Edison Z.A.C. de la Fleuriaye, B.P. 60433 44474 Carquefou / FR | [2021/40] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Trimble Nantes S.A.S. Headquarter Rue Th Edison Z.A.C. de la Fleuriaye, B.P. 60433 44474 Carquefoux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLIER, Stéphane c/o Trimble Nantes, S.A.S. Headquarter, Rue Th Edison Z.A.C. de la Fleuriaye, B.P. 60433 44474 Carquefoux / FR | 02 /
MOISSET, Eric c/o Trimble Nantes, S.A.S. Headquarter, Rue Th Edison Z.A.C. de la Fleuriaye, B.P. 60433 44474 Carquefoux / FR | 03 /
LEMAIRE, Charles c/o Trimble Nantes, S.A.S. Headquarter, Rue Th Edison Z.A.C. de la Fleuriaye, B.P. 60433 44474 Carquefoux / FR | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18290087.8 | 20.07.2018 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598178 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/51, G01S19/48, G01C15/00, G01S17/08, // G01S19/14 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G01C15/008 (EP,CN,US);
G01S17/08 (EP);
G01S19/35 (US);
G01S19/37 (CN);
G01S19/43 (US);
G01S19/45 (CN);
G01S19/47 (CN);
G01S19/48 (EP,CN,US);
G01S19/485 (EP);
G01S19/51 (US);
G06T7/70 (CN);
G01S15/08 (EP);
G01S19/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE POSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALT EINER GEOSPATIALEN POSITION | [2020/04] | English: | PORTABLE POSITIONING DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING A GEOSPATIAL POSITION | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE POSITIONNEMENT PORTABLES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UNE POSITION GÉOSPATIALE | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 09.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP22161701.2 / EP4036607 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011064312 (JANKY JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0084] - [0088] * [A] 1,15; | [XYI]US2011075886 (ASHJAEE JAVAD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,15 * figures 1, 2A-2C, 3-5, 6A-6B * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0 23] - [0053] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 14; | [XI]US2016035096 (RUDOW RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * figures 14,24-27, 38, 41, 71-72 * * paragraphs [0296] - [0298] - [ 376] - [0413] - [ 579] - [0596] - [ 856] - [0900] * [I] 8; | [YA]US2018017384 (SIERCKS KNUT [CH], et al) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1, 13-15b, 18-19b * * paragraphs [0161] , [0270] , [ 385] , [ 435] - [0459] - [ 525] - [0538] *[A] 1,15 |