EP3540634 - METHOD FOR AUDIO-VISUAL EVENTS CLASSIFICATION AND LOCALIZATION AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS COMPUTER READABLE PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUONG, Quang Khanh Ngoc c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
OZEROV, Alexey c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
PAREKH, Sanjeel c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 04 /
ESSID, Slim c/o TELECOM Paris Tech 46 Rue Barrault 75013 Paris / FR | 05 /
RICHARD, Gael c/o TELECOM ParisTech 46 Rue Barrault 75013 Paris / FR | 06 /
PEREZ, Patrick c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 18305270.3 | 13.03.2018 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540634 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G06V20/41 (EP,US);
G06F18/253 (EP);
G06V10/806 (EP,US);
G06V20/46 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (EP);
G10L25/30 (EP);
G10L25/51 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG UND LOKALISIERUNG VON AUDIO-VISUELLEN EREIGNISSEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES PROGRAMMPRODUKT UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/38] | English: | METHOD FOR AUDIO-VISUAL EVENTS CLASSIFICATION AND LOCALIZATION AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS COMPUTER READABLE PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CLASSIFICATION ET DE LOCALISATION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS AUDIOVISUELS ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT, PRODUIT-PROGRAMME LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007036431 (TERAKAWA KENSUKE [JP]) [I] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0011] - [0024] * [A] 3-11; | [IA]US8620078 (CHAPLEAU SYLVAIN [CA], et al) [I] 1,2,12,13 * column 1, line 46 - column 4, line 11 * [A] 3-11; | [A]US2016284346 (VISSER ERIK [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0004] - [0006]; claim - *; | [IA]US2018068198 (SAVVIDES MARIOS [US], et al) [I] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0026] , [0030]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-11 | by applicant | - ZITNICK; DOLL'AR, European Conference on Computer Vision, Springer, (20140000), pages 391 - 40 | - GIRSHICK R., IEEE International Conference on Computer Vision, (20150000), pages 1440 - 1448 | - BILEN H.; VEDALDI A., Proceedings of the IEEE Conference on Computer Vision and Pattern Recognition, (20160000), pages 2846 - 2854 | - HERSHEY, S.; CHAUDHURI, S.; ELLIS, D. P.; GEMMEKE, J. F.; JANSEN, A.; MOORE, R. C.; PLAKAL, M.; PLATT, D.; SAUROUS, R. A.; SEYBOLD, "Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing (ICASSP", IEEE International Conference, (20170000), pages 131 - 135 | - GKIOXARI G.; GIRSHICK R.; MALIK J., Proceedings of the IEEE International Conference on Computer Vision, (20150000), pages 1080 - 1088 |