Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11054513 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2021 | B2 | US2020003883 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18305858 | 02.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110736966B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2024 | B | CN110736966 | 31.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18305858 | 02.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3591433 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | EP3591433 | 08.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18305858 | 02.07.2018 |