EP3598975 - NOVEL COMBINATIONS OF A H3 ANTAGONIST AND A NORADRENALINE REUPTAKE INHIBITOR, AND THE THERAPEUTICAL USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioprojet 30 rue des Francs Bourgeois 75003 Paris / FR | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIGNEAU, Xavier 4 Square du Vivier Louis 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | 02 /
LANDAIS, Laurent 5 Le Haut Chemin 35340 Ercé-Près-Liffré / FR | 03 /
PERRIN, David 11 Rue des Pêchers 35850 Gévezé / FR | 04 /
LECOMTE, Jeanne Marie 30 rue des Francs-Bourgeois 75003 Paris / FR | 05 /
SCHWARTZ, Jean Charles 9 Villa Seurat 75014 Paris / FR | [2020/43] |
Former [2020/05] | 01 /
LIGNEAU, Xavier 4 Square du Vivier Louis 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | ||
02 /
LANDAIS, Laurent 5 Le haut Chemin 35340 Ercé-Près-Liffré / FR | |||
03 /
PERRIN, David 11 Rue des Pêchers 35340 Gévezé / FR | |||
04 /
LECOMTE, Jeanne Marie 30 rue des Francs-Bourgeois 75003 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
SCHWARTZ, Jean Charles 9 Villa Seurat 75014 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/05] | Application number, filing date | 18306017.7 | 27.07.2018 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598975 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598975 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/4545, A61K31/135, A61K31/381, A61K31/535, A61K31/55, A61P25/00, A61K45/06 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/4453 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/137 (CN,IL);
A61K31/381 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/535 (EP);
A61K31/5375 (CN,IL);
A61K31/55 (EP,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P25/14 (CN);
A61P25/16 (CN);
A61P25/24 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P25/26 (CN,US);
A61P25/28 (CN);
A61P25/30 (IL,KR);
A61P25/32 (CN,IL);
C07D295/092 (KR);
C07D401/12 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/381, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/4453, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4545, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/535, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5375, A61K2300/00 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE KOMBINATIONEN EINES H3-ANTAGONISTEN UND NORADRENALIN-WIEDERAUFNAHMEHEMMERS UND DEREN THERAPEUTISCHEN VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/05] | English: | NOVEL COMBINATIONS OF A H3 ANTAGONIST AND A NORADRENALINE REUPTAKE INHIBITOR, AND THE THERAPEUTICAL USES THEREOF | [2020/05] | French: | NOUVELLES COMBINAISONS D'UN ANTAGONISTE H3 ET UN INHIBITEUR DE LA RECAPTURE DE LA NORADRÉNALINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 13.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | LV | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006117609 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR], et al); | by applicant | WO2006117609 |