Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
06.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.08.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.01.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
25.08.2018 | Change - representative | |
13.08.2018 | Change - representative |