EP3617251 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYSILOXANE BEARING DIAMINOTRIAZINE MOIETIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52, Rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states RHODIA OPERATIONS 25 rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDELLE, Grégory 49, av. du général de Gaulle 69110 Sainte-Foy-lès-Lyon / FR | 02 /
AL RAHAL AL ORABI, Rabih 4 rue Vaisse 69006 Lyon / FR | 03 /
VERGELATI, Caroll 11, Montée du Pucelier 38118 Saint Baudille de la Tour / FR | 04 /
TOURAUD, Franck 106 Route de Saint Sorlin Eyzin Pinet / FR | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Roussel, Sandrine Specialty Operations France Intellectual Assets Management 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Roussel, Sandrine Rhodia Opérations Direction Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18306147.2 | 29.08.2018 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617251 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/388, C08L83/08, C08G65/00, C08L71/02, C09D183/08 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
C08L83/08 (EP);
C08G65/33317 (EP);
C08L71/02 (EP);
C09D183/08 (EP);
C08G77/26 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L83/08 (EP);
C08L83/08, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L83/08, C08L83/00 (EP);
C09D183/08, C08L71/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT POLYSILOXAN MIT DIAMINOTRIAZINEINHEITEN | [2020/10] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYSILOXANE BEARING DIAMINOTRIAZINE MOIETIES | [2020/10] | French: | COMPOSITION THERMOPLASTIQUE COMPRENANT UN POLYSILOXANE PORTANT DES FRACTIONS DIAMINOTRIAZINE | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/09] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US8575291 (KATAYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, line 21 - column 8, line 33 * * examples 1-5 *; | [A]US2013181361 (UEHARA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * Formula 1; paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * | by applicant | US8575291 | US7622131 | US3892643 | US2015166847 | US4855378 | US4113947 | US5712391 | JP2005194378 |