EP3664449 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POIRIER, Tangi c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson Sévigné Cedex / FR | 02 /
CHEN, Ya c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson Sévigné Cedex / FR | 03 /
NASER, Karam c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson Sévigné Cedex / FR | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Huchet, Anne InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 18306620.8 | 05.12.2018 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664449 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/129, H04N19/159, H04N19/176, H04N19/147, H04N19/157 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
H04N19/129 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/107 (KR);
H04N19/11 (KR);
H04N19/13 (KR,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/157 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDCODIERUNG UND -DECODIERUNG | [2020/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014166381 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0020]; tables 1, 2 * [I] 4; | [XDI] - KIDANI (KDDI) Y ET AL, "CE7: Block size dependent coefficient scanning (CE7.3)", no. JVET-L0379, (20180925), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0379-v1.zip, (20180925), XP030193886 [XD] 1-3,5,11-16 * sections 1, 2;; figures 1, 2 * [I] 4 | [A] - YUNFEI ZHENG ET AL, "CE11: Mode Dependent Coefficient Scanning", 95. MPEG MEETING; 24-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20110126), no. m19172, XP030047739 [A] 4 * sectoin 1 * | [A] - SEREGIN V ET AL, "Low-complexity adaptive coefficient scanning", 3. JCT-VC MEETING; 94. MPEG MEETING; 7-10-2010 - 15-10-2010; GUANGZHOU; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20101002), no. JCTVC-C205, XP030007912 [A] 4 * section 2 * |