Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP3536169


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2020 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.08.2020  [2020/34]
31.03.2020 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.08.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
15.03.2018 Change - representative