blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3536169

EP3536169 - ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND MICROPARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2020
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicium Espana Laboratorios, S.L.
C. Vilafortuny n°23, Nave 10
43480 Vila-Seca / ES
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HIERRO PILAS, Joan Carles
C. Vilafortuny nº23, Nave 10
43480 VILA-SECA / ES
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Rambla de Catalunya, 123
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date18382138.806.03.2018
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536169
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:A23L33/16, A23L29/25, A61K31/695, A61K47/36, A61K8/58, A61K8/73
[2019/37]
CPC:
A23L33/16 (EP); A61K47/36 (EP,US); A23L29/03 (US);
A23L29/25 (EP,US); A23L33/10 (US); A61K31/695 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US); A61K8/585 (EP,US); A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US); A61K9/16 (US); A61K9/1688 (US);
A61K9/5031 (EP); A61K9/5036 (EP); A61K9/5089 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US); A23V2002/00 (US); A61K2800/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/695, A61K2300/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ORGANOSILICIUMVERBINDUNGSMIKROPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2019/37]
English:ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND MICROPARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION[2019/37]
French:MICROPARTICULES DE COMPOSÉ D'ORGANOSILICIUM ET PROCESSUS DE PRÉPARATION[2019/37]
Examination procedure12.03.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/34]
01.04.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/34]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0242855  (LION CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example - *;
 [A]WO2011039336  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* example 1; claim 11 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.