EP3666906 - METHODS AND KITS FOR THE PROGNOSIS OF SQUAMOUS CELL CARCINOMAS (SCC) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZO MARTIN, Luis Francisco Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas Instituto de Biología Molecular y Celular del Cáncer - Centro de Investigación del Cáncer CAMPUS MIGUEL DE UNAMUNO 37007 Salamanca / ES | 02 /
GARCIA BUSTELO, Xosé Ramón Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas Instituto de Biología Molecular y Celular del Cáncer - Centro de Investigación del Cáncer CAMPUS MIGUEL DE UNAMUNO 37007 Salamanca / ES | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U. Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta Edificio LIMA 28046 Madrid / ES | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18382912.6 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666906 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR PROGNOSE VON PLATTENEPITHELKARZINOMEN (SCC) | [2020/25] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR THE PROGNOSIS OF SQUAMOUS CELL CARCINOMAS (SCC) | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET KITS POUR LE PRONOSTIC DE CARCINOMES DE CELLULES SQUAMEUSES (CCS) | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN108424970 (SHENZHEN YIKANG BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2006094733 (ONE CORP AS) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012013931 (QUEEN MARY & WESTFIELD COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010093379 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LAI STEPHEN Y ET AL, "Activated Vav2 modulates cellular invasion through Rac1 and Cdc42 in oral squamous cell carcinoma", ORAL ONCOLOGY, (200807), vol. 44, no. 7, ISSN 1368-8375, pages 683 - 688, XP022763328 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.oraloncology.2007.08.017 | [Y] - V. PATEL ET AL, "Persistent activation of Rac1 in squamous carcinomas of the head and neck: evidence for an EGFR/Vav2 signaling axis involved in cell invasion", CARCINOGENESIS., GB, (20070101), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1093/carcin/bgm008, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 1145 - 1152, XP055594599 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgm008 | [A] - RUGGIERO C ET AL, "VAV2: A novel prognostic marker and a druggable target for adrenocortical carcinoma", ONCOTARGET 2017 IMPACT JOURNALS LLC USA, (2017), vol. 8, no. 51, ISSN 1949-2553, pages 88257 - 88258, XP002791956 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.21448 | [A] - GUTTMAN D ET AL, "Expression of MMP-9, TIMP-1, CD-34 and factor-8 as prognostic markers for squamous cell carcinoma of the tongue", ORAL ONCO, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (20040901), vol. 40, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.ORALONCOLOGY.2004.01.006, ISSN 1368-8375, pages 798 - 803, XP004525205 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.oraloncology.2004.01.006 | [A] - LI YADONG ET AL, "AURKA is a predictor of chemotherapy response and prognosis for patients with advanced oral squamous cell carcinoma", TUMOR BIOLOGY, KARGER, BASEL, CH, vol. 36, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S13277-014-2992-8, ISSN 1010-4283, (20141230), pages 3557 - 3564, (20141230), XP036218314 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13277-014-2992-8 | by applicant | - KAPLAN, MEIER, Amer. Statist. Assn., vol. 53, pages 457 - 481 | - BARBIE DA; TAMAYO P et al., "Systematic RNA interference reveals that oncogenic KRAS-driven cancers require TBK1", Nature, (20090000), vol. 462, pages 108 - 112 |