10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
08.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
16.02.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
22.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
10.03.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
03.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.11.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.09.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
11.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.07.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
03.07.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.08.2018 |
Change - representative |
|