Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019243977 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18425045 | 18.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3584549 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2023 | B1 | EP3584549 | 25.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18425045 | 18.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2946890T | 27.07.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18425045 | 18.06.2018 |