EP3569735 - LASER DEPOSITION PROCESSES FOR COATING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polskie Zaklady Lotnicze Sp. Z.o.o. Wojska Polskiego 3 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dworak, Adam Dabrowica 204 3-450 Baranów Sandomierski / PL | 02 /
Koruba, Piotr ul. Zgodna 6/7 50432 Wroclaw / PL | 03 /
Jurewicz, Piotr ul. Szpitalna 2/9 53-511 Wroclaw / PL | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18461556.5 | 14.05.2018 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569735 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/08, C23C24/10 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C23C24/08 (EP);
C23C24/10 (EP);
C23C24/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERAUFTRAGSVERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2019/47] | English: | LASER DEPOSITION PROCESSES FOR COATING ARTICLES | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉPÔT AU LASER POUR LE REVÊTEMENT D'ARTICLES | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PIOTR KORUBA ET AL, "Ultra-High Speed Laser Cladding (UHSLC) technology for Stellite 6 functional coatings deposition in aviation industry", PRZEGLAD SPAWALNICTWA, (20170701), vol. 89, no. 6, doi:http://dx.doi.org/10.26628/ps.v89i6.781, pages 15 - 19, XP055507995 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://dx.doi.org/10.26628/ps.v89i6.781 | [XAI] - SCHOPPHOVEN THOMAS ET AL, "Investigations on ultra-high-speed laser material deposition as alternative for hard chrome plating and thermal spraying", JOURNAL OF LASER APPLICATIONS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20160331), vol. 28, no. 2, doi:10.2351/1.4943910, XP012206487 [X] 1-4,9,11 * Sections II and III;; figures 1,6-16; claims 1-2 * [A] 7,8,10,12-15 [I] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2351/1.4943910 |