EP3568307 - DECORATED SURFACE-STRUCTURED WALL OR FLOOR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch / DE | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNIG, Hans-Jürgen Eidechsenweg 8 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/24] |
Former [2019/47] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18700163.1 | 10.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018EP50580 | Priority number, date | EP20170151000 | 11.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17151000 | [2019/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130580 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568307 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3568307 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/24, B44C5/04 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B44C5/04 (EP,US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/043 (US);
B44C5/0438 (US);
B44C5/0461 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEKORIERTES OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTURIERTES WAND- ODER BODENPANEEL | [2019/47] | English: | DECORATED SURFACE-STRUCTURED WALL OR FLOOR PANEL | [2019/47] | French: | PANNEAU DE SOL OU MURAL À SURFACE STRUCTURÉE ET DÉCORÉE | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/47] | PANNEAU MURAL OU PANNEAU DE SOL DÉCORATIF À SURFACE STRUCTURÉE | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 13.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | IE | 10.01.2023 | LU | 10.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
IE | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | EE | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | EE | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012001109 (SPANOLUX N V DIV BALTERIO [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1 - page 15; claim 8 *; | [A]DE202011107844U (SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0026] *; | [Y]DE102012022461 (SÜDDEKOR GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]EP2927017 (SPANOLUX N V DIV BALTERIO [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0040]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP2829415 |