EP3568213 - CONSTANT-PRESSURE VALVE, AND ALARM VALVE STATION AND SPRINKLER SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax GmbH & Co. KG Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Minimax GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZLATINTSIS, Chrysafis Kieler Straße 449 24536 Neumünster / DE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18700882.6 | 12.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018EP50749 | Priority number, date | DE201710100505 | 12.01.2017 Original published format: DE102017100505 | [2019/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130649 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568213 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/68, F16K31/126, F16K31/56, A62C35/60, F16K37/00, A62C37/44, F16K31/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A62C35/68 (EP,US);
A62C35/605 (EP,US);
F16K31/003 (EP,US);
F16K31/165 (EP,US);
A62C37/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | KONSTANTDRUCKVENTIL, SOWIE ALARMVENTILSTATION UND SPRINKLERANLAGE MIT SELBIGEM | [2019/47] | English: | CONSTANT-PRESSURE VALVE, AND ALARM VALVE STATION AND SPRINKLER SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME | [2019/47] | French: | SOUPAPE À PRESSION CONSTANTE, ET STATION DE SOUPAPE D'ALARME ET SYSTÈME DE GICLEUR | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 12.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1310041 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 65 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO9959679 (RELIABLE AUTO SPRINKLER CO [US]) [X] 15-24 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 30 * * figure - *; | [A]JP2007286944 (KOATSU CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2009222220 (WILKE GALEN D [US]) [A] 1-14* figure 2 * | by applicant | US9289635 |