EP3740913 - RADIO-BASED OCCUPANCIES IN VENUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222-226 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIROLA, Lauri Aarne Johannes c/o HERE Platform Visiokatu 3 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
SYRJÄRINNE, Jari Tapani c/o HERE Platform Visiokatu 3 33720 Tampere / FI | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18701001.2 | 15.01.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018EP50866 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137624 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740913 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
H04W4/021 (US);
G07C9/38 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | FUNKBASIERTE BELEGUNGEN AN VERANSTALTUNGSORTEN | [2020/48] | English: | RADIO-BASED OCCUPANCIES IN VENUES | [2020/48] | French: | OCCUPATIONS BASÉES SUR LA RADIO DANS DES LIEUX DE RÉUNION | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 17.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2000962 (TNO [NL]) [X] 1-5,9-15,19,20 * fig. 1, 2, par. 1, 9, 12-31, 34, 36-42 * [Y] 6-8,16-18,21; | [Y]US2012046044 (JAMTGAARD MARK [US], et al) [Y] 6-8,16-18,21* fig. 13, 14; par. 38, 89 *; | [XY] - MATHIAS VERSICHELE ET AL, "The use of Bluetooth for analysing spatiotemporal dynamics of human movement at mass events: A case study of the Ghent Festivities", APPLIED GEOGRAPHY, vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.APGEOG.2011.05.011, ISSN 0143-6228, (20120331), pages 208 - 220, (20110603), XP028111844 [X] 1-5,9-15,19,20 * p. 212, 213 * [Y] 6-8,16-18,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apgeog.2011.05.011 |