EP3573829 - MULTI-LAYER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCALA, Attilio P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
BACCARO, Lucio c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18701358.6 | 26.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018EP52014 | Priority number, date | EP20170153240 | 26.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17153240 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138294 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573829 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B32B1/08, B32B25/14, B32B27/18, B32B27/08, B32B7/12 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L23/0815 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/242 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/40 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (US);
B32B2553/00 (EP);
B32B2571/00 (US);
C08L2203/16 (US);
C08L2205/02 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
C08L2207/066 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE FOLIE | [2019/49] | English: | MULTI-LAYER FILM | [2019/49] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 19.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO0037240 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al); | [IY]US2010266826 (YONEZAWA TAKAKI [JP]); | [A]US2012028017 (SARAF ANIL W [US], et al); | [IY]WO2016079367 (UPM RAFLATAC OY [FI]) | by applicant | US8685523 |