EP3580004 - SAW BEADS WITH REDUCED FLATTENING BEHAVIOR AND A SAW CORD COMPRISING SUCH BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NV Bekaert SA Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem West Vlaanderen / BE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANEECKE, Jan Zijstraat 15 8800 Roeselare / BE | 02 /
BAEKELANDT, Tom Heerweg-Noord 50 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Seynhaeve, Geert Filiep NV Bekaert SA IPD - PC6030 Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18701500.3 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018EP52465 | Priority number, date | EP20170155169 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155169 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018145980 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580004 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/18, B28D1/08 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
B23D61/185 (EP);
B28D1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | SÄGEKÜGELCHEN MIT REDUZIERTEM VERFLACHUNGSVERHALTEN UND EINE SÄGESCHNUR MIT DERARTIGEN KÜGELCHEN | [2021/16] | English: | SAW BEADS WITH REDUCED FLATTENING BEHAVIOR AND A SAW CORD COMPRISING SUCH BEADS | [2019/51] | French: | PERLE DE SCIE AVEC RÉDUCTION DU COMPORTEMENT À L'APLATISSEMENT ET CÂBLE DE SCIE COMPRENANT DE TELLES PERLES | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/51] | SÄGEKÜGELCHEN MIT REDUZIERTEM VERFLACHUNGSVERHALTEN UND EINE SÄGESCHNUR MIT SOLCHEN KÜGELCHEN | ||
Former [2019/51] | BILLES DE SCIE À COMPORTEMENT D'APLATISSEMENT RÉDUIT ET CORDON DE SCIE COMPRENANT DE TELLES BILLES | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]EP2495062 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [X] 1-4,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] , [0025] , [0026] , [0028] , [0030] , [0060] , [0061] * * figures 2a,8 * [A] 8 [Y] 13,14 [I] 5-7; | [XA]JPH09103916 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * [A] 5,11,12; | [X]JPH09225736 (NORITAKE DIA KK, et al) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * * figures 3a-3c *; | [X]JPH09225737 (NORITAKE DIA KK, et al) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * * figure 4B *; | [YDA]WO2015180947 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [YD] 13,14 * paragraph [0001] * * figure - * [A] 1 | by applicant | WO2016188978 | WO2013102542 | US2679839 | WO2012119947 | WO2011061166 | WO2014082870 | WO2015180947 | WO2016050508 |