EP3569035 - SUSCEPTORS FOR INDUCTION HEATING WITH THERMAL UNIFORMITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | For all designated states King Fahd University of Petroleum and Minerals Eastern Province Dhahran 34464 / SA | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiaohang 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 02 /
LI, Kuang-Hui 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 03 /
ALOTAIBI, Hamad Saud Eastern Province Dhahran 34464 / SA | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/47] | Tessier, Benoit Sebastien, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 18701585.4 | 10.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018IB50157 | Priority number, date | US201762444558P | 10.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762444558 P | US201762444877P | 11.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762444877 P | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130953 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569035 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3569035 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/10, C23C16/458, C23C16/46, C23C16/12, C30B25/12 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H05B6/105 (EP);
C23C16/4583 (EP);
C23C16/46 (EP);
C30B25/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUSZEPTOREN ZUR INDUKTIONSERWÄRMUNG MIT THERMISCHER GLEICHMÄSSIGKEIT | [2019/47] | English: | SUSCEPTORS FOR INDUCTION HEATING WITH THERMAL UNIFORMITY | [2019/47] | French: | SUSCEPTEURS POUR CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION AVEC UNIFORMITÉ THERMIQUE | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 23.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23184258.4 / EP4242361 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19622402 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 19,20; | [A]US2003209326 (LEE YOUNG JAI [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010108744 (FRENI BREMBO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]US2016021707 (IBRANI SOKOL [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12,16 * abstract * [I] 7-10,13-15,17-20 |