EP3571027 - PERSONAL CARE BOTTLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company LLC One Gillette Park Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EAGLETON, Christopher, Raymond 460 Basingstoke Road Reading Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB | 02 /
BRIDGES, Kelly, Daniel One Gillette Park Boston Massachusetts 02127 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/48] | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 18701940.1 | 03.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US12147 | Priority number, date | US201762447084P | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447084 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018136229 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571027 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571027 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/44, B26B21/52, A45D34/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B26B21/446 (EP,US);
A45D34/00 (EP,US);
A45D34/06 (EP,US);
B26B21/521 (EP,US);
B26B21/528 (EP,US);
B65B3/022 (US);
B65D83/0055 (US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEFLASCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2019/48] | English: | PERSONAL CARE BOTTLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2019/48] | French: | BOUTEILLE POUR SOINS PERSONNELS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 02.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [X]US3080989 (RAMSBOTHAM ROBERT W) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5784790 (CARSON III WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 2,9 * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 33 *; | [A]US2005132574 (TOMASSETTI LOUIS D [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 2,3,8 *; | [A]WO2008152601 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]WO2012058500 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 9 * * page 7, line 19 - page 20, line 24 * * figures 3-11 * |