EP3559145 - HIGH PERFORMANCE BRINE VISCOSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue 31311 Dhahran / SA | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUL, Peter J. Aramco Services Company 16300 Park Row Houston TX 77084 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18702023.5 | 11.01.2018 | [2019/44] | WO2018US13339 | Priority number, date | US201762444895P | 11.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762444895 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132586 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559145 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/035, C09K8/12 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C09K8/12 (EP,US);
C09K8/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGES SOLEVERDICKUNGSMITTEL | [2019/44] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE BRINE VISCOSIFIER | [2019/44] | French: | AMÉLIORANT DE VISCOSITÉ HAUTE PERFORMANCE POUR SAUMURE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 11.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0071635 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2004094781 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * page 3, lines 2-32, page 4, line 10 through page 6, line 15, Figures, Examples, claims * [I] 2-13,15-25; | [XI]WO2008068467 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * page 3, paragraph [0009] through page 4, paragraph [0011], page 5, paragraph [0017] through page 9, paragraph [0028], Figures 1-3, Examples, claims * [I] 2-13,15-25; | [A]WO2011023967 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012186877 (EZELL RYAN G [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document * |