|
24.11.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
28.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2019 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
03.01.2019 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.01.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.2018 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.11.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.11.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
29.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
27 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
39 |