Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11312932 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2022 | B2 | US2019382700 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110291184 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3574080 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | B1 | EP3574080 | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019015559 | 17.03.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2859480T | 04.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12019501779 | 29.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3574080T | 23.08.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52180 | 29.01.2018 | EP18702477 | 29.01.2018 | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018138368 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3354718 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE054223T | 30.08.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP17153818 | 30.01.2017 |