|
10.08.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
16.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
18.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.08.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
81 |
|
15.08.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
05.04.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
43 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |