Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102061129B | Global Dossier | 31.12.2019 | B1 | KR20190105010 | 11.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6982082B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2021 | B2 | JP2020515112 | 21.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110214422B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B | CN110214422 | 06.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3571777 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2021 | B1 | EP3571777 | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019014357 | 27.02.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2897644T | 02.03.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201905065U | 27.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | WO2018US12794 | 08.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018136254 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10412769 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B2 | US2018206274 | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021007245 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715842781 | 14.12.2017 | US201762447272 | 17.01.2017 |