EP3568205 - TREATMENT OF CANCER CELLS OVEREXPRESSING SOMATOSTATIN RECEPTORS USING OCREOTIDE DERIVATIVES CHELATED TO RADIOISOTOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiomedix Inc. 9701 Richmond Avenue, Suite 222 Houston, TX 77042 / US | For all designated states Orano Med 125 avenue de Paris 92320 Châtillon / FR | [2022/08] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Radiomedix Inc. 9701 Richmond Avenue, Suite 222 Houston, TX 77042 / US | ||
For all designated states Orano Med SAS 1 Place Jean Millier Tour Areva 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TWOROWSKA, Izabela 3518 Omeara Dr. Houston TX 77025 / US | 02 /
WAGH, Nilesh 3400 Woodchase Dr. Apt. 2535 Houston TX 77042 / US | 03 /
DELPASSAND, Ebrahim S. 2115 River Oaks Blv. Houston TX 77019 / US | 04 /
ROJAS-QUIJANO, Federico 1924 Oak Timber Dr. Bedford TX 76021 / US | 05 /
JUREK, Paul 128 Wooded Creek Dr. Red Oak TX 75154 / US | 06 /
KIEFER, Garry E. 3301 Jasmine Lane Richardson TX 75082 / US | 07 /
STALLONS, Tania A. 1748 Wildflower Ln. Wylie TX 75098 / US | 08 /
SAIDI, Amal 5 Chemin des Tissottes 74200 Thonon-Les-Bains / FR | 09 /
TORGUE, Julien 8 Granite Place Unit 265 Gaithersburg MD 20878 / US | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/33] |
Former [2019/47] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18703122.4 | 12.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018US13640 | Priority number, date | US201762445541P | 12.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762445541 P | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132751 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568205 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3568205 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/04, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61K51/08, A61K103/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K51/0482 (IL,KR,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K51/083 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/10 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | A61P35/00, A61K51/04, A61K51/08, A61K103/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON SOMATOSTATIN REZEPTOREN ÜBEREXPRIMIERENDEN KREBSZELLEN MIT MIT RADIOISOTOPE CHELATGEBUNDENE OCTREOTIDDERIVATEN | [2023/15] | English: | TREATMENT OF CANCER CELLS OVEREXPRESSING SOMATOSTATIN RECEPTORS USING OCREOTIDE DERIVATIVES CHELATED TO RADIOISOTOPES | [2019/47] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE CELLULES CANCÉREUSES EXPRIMANT RECEPTEURS DE LA SOMATOSTATINE EN EXCÈS AVEC DES DÉRIVÉS DE L'OCTRÉOTIDE CHELÉ AVEC DES RADIOISOTOPES | [2023/15] |
Former [2019/47] | BEHANDLUNG VON KREBSZELLEN, DIE SOMATOSTATIN-REZEPTOREN ÜBEREXPRIMIEREN, UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ZU RADIOISOTOPEN CHELATIERTEN OCREOTIDDERIVATEN | ||
Former [2019/47] | TRAITEMENT DE CELLULES CANCÉREUSES SUREXPRIMANT LES RÉCEPTEURS DE LA SOMATOSTATINE À L'AIDE DE DÉRIVÉS D'OCTRÉOTIDE CHÉLATÉS AUX RADIO-ISOTOPES | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 12.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004044177 (MACKE HELMUT ROBERT [DE], et al); | [X]US2014147381 (ESPENAN GREGORY DAVID [US]); | [XI]US2015196673 (NORENBERG JEFFREY P [US]); | [A]WO2016046793 (SOUTH AFRICAN NUCLEAR ENERGY [ZA], et al); | [A]CN106084005 (GUANGZHOU GENERAL HOSPITAL OF GUANGZHOU MILITARY COMMAND); | Examination | FR3069245 | by applicant | US5804157 | US6225284 | US6358491 | US6683162 | US2007025910 | US7202330 | US2009087377 | US2010316566 | US2012052008 | WO2014052471 | US2014228551 | US8858916 | US2015196673 | US9217009 | US2016143926 | US9408928 |