EP3577817 - FEEDBACK TIMING MANAGEMENT FOR LOW LATENCY COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
HOSSEINI, Seyedkianoush 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18703173.7 | 22.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US14693 | Priority number, date | US201762453485P | 01.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762453485 P | US201715706059 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: US201715706059 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144261 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577817 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H04W28/0205 (EP,US);
H04L1/002 (US);
H04L1/0028 (US);
H04L1/18 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L5/0037 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSTAKTUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR KOMMUNIKATION MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ | [2019/50] | English: | FEEDBACK TIMING MANAGEMENT FOR LOW LATENCY COMMUNICATIONS | [2019/50] | French: | GESTION DE TEMPS DE RÉTROACTION POUR COMMUNICATIONS À FAIBLE LATENCE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 13.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016088652 (PATEL SHIMMAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2016150532 (BHUSHAN NAGA [US], et al); |