EP3580804 - FUNCTIONALIZED SULFONYL FLUORIDE ADDITIVES FOR ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR LITHIUM ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Zhenji 7-1-13 Doi-cho Amagasaki 660-0083 / JP | 02 /
FUKUZUMI, Takeo 7-1-13 Doi-cho Amagasaki 660-0083 / JP | 03 /
SAWADA, Eri 7-1-13 Doi-cho Amagasaki 660-0083 / JP | 04 /
SCHULZ-DOBRICK, Martin 7-1-13 Doi-cho Amagasaki 660-0083 / JP | 05 /
KIM, Jinbum 7-1-13 Doi-cho Amagasaki 660-0083 / JP | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18703739.5 | 02.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018EP52618 | Priority number, date | EP20170155031 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155031 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146007 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580804 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M2300/0017 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0025 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE SULFONYL FLUORIDE ZUSATZSTOFFE FÜR ELEKTROLYTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LITHIUM ION BATTERIEN | [2020/33] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED SULFONYL FLUORIDE ADDITIVES FOR ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR LITHIUM ION BATTERIES | [2019/51] | French: | ADDITIFS DE FLUORURE DE SULFONYL FONCTIONNALISÉS POUR LA COMPOSITION D'ÉLECTROLYTE POUR LES BATTERIES AU LITHIUM ION | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | FUNKTIONALISIERTE SULFONYLFLUORIDADDITIVE FÜR ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIEN | ||
Former [2019/51] | ADDITIFS DE FLUORURE DE SULFONYLE FONCTIONNALISÉS POUR COMPOSITION D'ÉLECTROLYTE POUR BATTERIES AU LITHIUM-ION | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 09.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008138714 (IHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0020] , [0027] * * compound 3(3) *; | [A]US2009053612 (IHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0013] - [0017] - [0025] , [0037] , [0038] , [0055] , [0131] , [0132] , [0155] , [0158] , [0162] , [0163] , [0173] ** compounds 52(2)-52(8) *; | [A] - JAMES J. KRUTAK ET AL, "Chemistry of ethenesulfonyl fluoride. Fluorosulfonylethylation of organic compounds", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19791001), vol. 44, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jo01336a022, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3847 - 3858, XP055373902 [A] 1-15 * table V; compound 56 * * page 3856 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01336a022 | by applicant | US2008138714 | US2009053612 | WO2013026854 | EP2750238 | WO2014104221 | JP2014183009 | - J. J. KRUTAK, J. Org. Chem., vol. 44, no. 279, pages 3847 - 3858 | - R. ELAZARI et al., Electrochem. Comm., (20120000), vol. 14, pages 21 - 24 |