EP3586571 - A RETROFIT LIGHT EMITTING DIODE, LED, LIGHTING DEVICE FOR CONNECTION TO AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER ZANDEN, Henricus Theodorus c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN BIGGELAAR, Theodorus Johannes Petrus c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
TAO, Haimin c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
STOBBELAAR, Pieter Johannes c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18703803.9 | 14.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018EP53686 | Priority number, date | EP20170158032 | 27.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17158032 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018153751 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586571 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/37, H05B47/19 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
F21K9/278 (US);
H05B45/3578 (US);
H05B47/195 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | H05B33/08, H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | EINE RETROFIT LED-BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN AN EINEM BALLAST | [2020/17] | English: | A RETROFIT LIGHT EMITTING DIODE, LED, LIGHTING DEVICE FOR CONNECTION TO AN ELECTRONIC BALLAST | [2020/01] | French: | UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE RETROFIT AUX LEDS POUR LA CONNEXION À UN BALLAST ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/17] |
Former [2020/01] | NACHRÜSTBARE LEUCHTDIODE (LED), BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSCHLUSS AN EIN ELEKTRONISCHES VORSCHALTGERÄT | ||
Former [2020/01] | DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE DE RATTRAPAGE, DEL, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE CONNECTÉ À UN BALLAST ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016022612 (INNOSYS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0088]; figure 32 *; | [A]WO2016178727 (LIGHTEL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15* pages 18-19; figure 6 * | by applicant | US2015198290 | WO2016022612 |