EP3571019 - AUTOMATED MOVEMENT ORCHESTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITAL, Vijay MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
ABRAHAM, Robin MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18703869.0 | 12.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US13424 | Priority number, date | US201762447817P | 18.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447817 P | US201715436694 | 17.02.2017 Original published format: US201715436694 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018136313 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571019 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, G06N5/02, G06N3/00, G06K9/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
B25J9/161 (EP);
B25J9/163 (EP);
B25J9/1694 (EP);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F18/29 (EP,US);
G06N3/008 (EP,US);
G06N5/022 (EP,US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/84 (EP,US);
G06V20/00 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE BEWEGUNGSORCHESTRIERUNG | [2019/48] | English: | AUTOMATED MOVEMENT ORCHESTRATION | [2019/48] | French: | ORGANISATION DE MOUVEMENT AUTOMATISÉE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 18.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2011170789 (HASEGAWA OSAMU) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * [I] 5; | [I] - SMUTS W B ET AL, "Using discrete AI techniques for designing a real-world control supervisor", ANNUAL REVIEW IN AUTOMATIC PROGRAMMING,, vol. 15, doi:10.1016/0066-4138(89)90006-2, ISSN 0066-4138, (19890101), pages 31 - 35, (19890101), XP024213639 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0066-4138(89)90006-2 | [XI] - Anonymous, "Google Announces Launch of Google Maps for Mobile With "My Location" Technology - News announcements - News from Google - Google", (20071128), URL: http://googlepress.blogspot.de/2007/11/google-announces-launch-of-google-maps_28.html, (20171214), XP055435212 [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * [I] 5,6 | [I] - WRIGHT M, "NEURAL NETWORKS TACKLE REAL-WORLD PROBLEMS", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS.(TEXAS INSTRUMENT), REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (19901108), vol. 35, no. 23, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 79 - 82,84,86, XP000172379 [I] 1-10 * abstract * |