EP3586326 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SECURE AND EFFICIENT PROVISION OF AT LEAST PARTLY AUTOMATED DRIVING MODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JURK, Reinhard Weiherweg 25 82194 Groebenzell / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18703967.2 | 05.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018EP52777 | Priority number, date | DE201710203022 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017203022 | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018153644 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586326 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586326 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G05D1/02, G08G1/0967 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G08G1/164 (EP);
H04L63/123 (US);
G06F21/305 (US);
G08G1/096725 (EP);
G08G1/096741 (EP);
G08G1/096775 (EP);
B60W2556/45 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN UND EFFIZIENTEN BEREITSTELLUNG VON ZUMINDEST TEILAUTONOMEN FAHRMODI | [2020/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SECURE AND EFFICIENT PROVISION OF AT LEAST PARTLY AUTOMATED DRIVING MODES | [2020/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA MISE À DISPOSITION SÛRE ET EFFICACE DE MODES DE CONDUITE AU MOINS SEMI-AUTONOMES | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 30.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102012021282 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 8] - [0010] - [0 17] - [0020] - [0 32] , [0 35] , [0 57] , [0061] , [0 62] , [0 71] , [0 76] , [0 77] ** claims 1,10, 13-19 *; | [XY]DE102014013672 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 6] - [0008] - [0 11] , [0 12] , [0 15] , [0 20] - [0023] - [0 30] , [0 34] , [0 52] , [0 53] * * claims 1, 10 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3-7,9,10; | [IA]EP2858039 (DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT & RAUMFAHRT EV [DE]) [I] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [00 9] , [0 11] , [0 13] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 37] * * claims 1, 3-7, 10-14 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4,6,9,10; | [YA]DE102015002405 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 3-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [00 9] - [0016] - [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 23] , [0 37] , [0 40] - [0044] * * claims 1-15 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,2,8 |