EP3571254 - BIODEGRADABLE HOT MELT ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meredian, Inc. 140 Industrial Boulevard Bainbridge, GA 39817 / US | [2022/44] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Meredian, Inc. 140 Industrial Boulevard Bainbridge, GA 39818 / US | ||
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Danimer Bioplastics, Inc. 1301 Colquitt Highway Bainbridge, Georgia 39817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRAWAY, Daniel 1301 Colquitt Highway Bainbridge GA 39817 / US | 02 /
WANN, Steven 1301 Colquitt Highway Bainbridge GA 39817 / US | 03 /
ARNOLD, Rachelle 925 Cameron Drive Bainbridge GA 39819 / US | 04 /
GRUBBS III, Joe, B. 2753 Whitlow Creek Drive Bishop GA 30621 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2019/48] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 18704112.4 | 19.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US14321 | Priority number, date | US201762448483P | 20.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762448483 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018136679 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571254 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571254 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/06, C09J167/04 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C09J167/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/35 (EP,KR,US);
C08L31/04 (KR);
C08L67/02 (KR);
C08L67/04 (KR);
C09J11/08 (KR,US);
C09J9/00 (KR,US);
C09J2301/304 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/312 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C09J167/04, C08L31/04, C08L67/02, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C09J2431/00, C09J2467/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE SCHMELZKLEBSTOFFE | [2019/48] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE HOT MELT ADHESIVES | [2019/48] | French: | ADHÉSIFS THERMOFUSIBLES BIODÉGRADABLES | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 18.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2657187 (LLOYD EVANS JOHN, et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1236753 (HYCAIL B V [NL]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014074115 (DANIMER SCIENT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * examples 5-7; table A * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0046] - [0047] - [0042] - [0043] * * claims 1-32 * | Examination | - Md Lechner ET AL, "Makromolekulare Chemie - Ein Lehrbuch für Chemiker, Physiker, Materialwissenschaftler und Verfahrenstechnike", MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, (20030101), page 237, ISBN 978-3-7643-5343-8, XP055500155 | - Anonymous, "FAQ Brookfield measurements", (20190613), URL: https://www.brookfieldengineering.com/learning-center/faq, (20190613), XP055596253 |