|
10.02.2025 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2025 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
20.08.2019 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
20.08.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.08.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.08.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.04.2019 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.04.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.04.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
13.04.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |