Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3635600 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201810079544 EP18704725 US2018015503W US201815980694 US201916371860 US202017084172



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11537699Global Dossier 27.12.2022B2
US2021049251 18.02.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201916371860 01.04.2019
US201762556367 09.09.2017
US201815980694 15.05.2018
US202017084172 29.10.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10839058Global Dossier 17.11.2020B2
US2019236254 01.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201916371860 01.04.2019
US201762556367 09.09.2017
US201815980694 15.05.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10824705Global Dossier 03.11.2020B2
US2018352440 06.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017
US201815980694 15.05.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3635600Global Dossier 15.04.2020A1
Priority number Date
WO2018US15503 26.01.2018
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN209312029U 27.08.2019U
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017
CN201820136797 26.01.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018226263Global Dossier 13.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN108985024BGlobal Dossier 14.02.2023B
CN108985024 11.12.2018A
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN208314779U 01.01.2019U
Priority number Date
US201762514906 04.06.2017
US201762556367 09.09.2017