blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3635600

EP3635600 - AUTHENTICATION TECHNIQUES IN RESPONSE TO ATTEMPTS TO ACCESS SENSITIVE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.12.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014-2094 / US
[2020/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BALLARD, Lucia, E.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
02 / HAUCK, Jerrold, V.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
03 / PRAKASH, Deepti, Sunder
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
04 / CIBULKA, Jan
Husinecka 548/7
13000 Prague / CZ
05 / KRSTIC, Ivan
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
 [2020/16]
Representative(s)Wardle, Callum Tarn
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2020/16]Wardle, Callum Tarn
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date18704725.326.01.2018
[2020/16]
WO2018US15503
Priority number, dateUS201762514906P04.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762514906 P
US201762556367P09.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762556367 P
[2020/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018226263
Date:13.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3635600
Date:15.04.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/32, H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04L29/06
[2020/16]
CPC:
G06F21/32 (EP,CN,US); G06F21/34 (US); G06F21/46 (CN);
G06F21/6218 (US); G06F21/78 (US); H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US); H04L9/3226 (US); H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
H04M1/724631 (EP,US); H04W12/065 (EP); H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US); G06F2221/2149 (US); G06F2221/2153 (US);
G06Q20/3227 (US); H04L2463/082 (EP,US); H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04W12/40 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/16]
TitleGerman:AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSTECHNIKEN ALS REAKTION AUF ZUGANGSEMPFINDLICHE INFORMATIONEN[2020/16]
English:AUTHENTICATION TECHNIQUES IN RESPONSE TO ATTEMPTS TO ACCESS SENSITIVE INFORMATION[2020/16]
French:TECHNIQUES D'AUTHENTIFICATION EN RÉPONSE À DES TENTATIVES D'ACCÈS À DES INFORMATIONS SENSIBLES[2020/16]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2019National basic fee paid 
05.12.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/16]
05.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.09.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
18.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2016105553  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1-8,10-22 * figures 1-3, 10A-10C * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0091] * [I] 9;
 [XI]US2017142589  (PARK JI YOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-8,10-22 * figures 5-13 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0181] *[I] 9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.