EP3576647 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH NAVIGATION WIRE INTERFACE FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acclarent, Inc. 33 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92618 / US | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited 101 Park Avenue 26th Floor New York, NY 10178 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ, Jephrey 218 San Rafael Circle Placentia California 92870 / US | 02 /
VELONI, Todd A. 33 Technology Drive Irvine California 92618 / US | 03 /
MEHRZAI, Nawid E. 33 Technology Drive Irvine California 92618 / US | 04 /
MORE, Amit A. 3800 Parkview Lane Apt. 12 B Irvine California 92612 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18704813.7 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16397 | Priority number, date | US201762453235P | 01.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762453235 P | US201715878489 | 01.02.2017 Original published format: US201715878489 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144702 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576647 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/24, A61B34/20, A61B5/06 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A61B17/24 (EP);
A61B34/20 (EP);
A61B5/062 (EP);
A61B90/14 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP);
A61B2218/007 (EP);
A61B2505/05 (EP);
A61B5/004 (EP);
A61B5/066 (EP);
A61M1/7411 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT NAVIGATIONSDRAHTSCHNITTSTELLENFUNKTION | [2019/50] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH NAVIGATION WIRE INTERFACE FEATURES | [2019/50] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL AVEC CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'INTERFACE DE FIL DE NAVIGATION | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 29.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3885565 (SATCHELL FRED E) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]WO2010108017 (ACCLARENT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] - [0087]; figures 1-27 * [I] 6-8,10; | [A]US2011270081 (BURG BRUCE M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0056]; figures 1-4,10 *; | [AD]WO2016007595 (ACCLARENT INC [US]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [00039] - [000123]; figures 1-14 * | by applicant | US2007208252 | US7720521 | US2011060214 | US8123722 | US8190389 | US8320711 | US8702626 | US2014200444 | US2014364725 | US9155492 | US9167961 | US9198736 | US2016008083 | US2016310042 |