EP3582970 - ASSEMBLY AS WELL AS USE THEREOF, CLEANING CASSETTE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING PRINTING CYLINDERS OF A PRINTING SYSTEM. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/52] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING PRINTING CYLINDERS | ||
[2023/50] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldwin Jimek AB Testvägen 16 232 37 Arlöv / SE | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARKENLJUNG, Ulf Stenkällevägen 59 212 33 Malmö / SE | 02 /
HANSSON, Birger Månskensgränd 10 234 40 Lomma / SE | 03 /
MAIER, Martin Kirchstrasse 4 73066 Uhingen / DE | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2024/17] |
Former [2019/52] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18705621.3 | 14.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018EP53719 | Priority number, date | SE20170050145 | 15.02.2017 Original published format: SE 1750145 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018149890 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582970 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3582970 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00, B41F35/02, B41F35/04, B41F35/06 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
B41F35/04 (EP,US);
B08B1/30 (EP,US);
B41F35/00 (EP);
B41F35/02 (EP,US);
B41F35/06 (EP,US);
B41P2235/24 (EP,US);
B41P2235/242 (EP,US);
B41P2235/244 (EP);
B41P2235/246 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SET SOWIE VERWENDUNG DAVON, REINIGUNGSKASSETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON DRUCKZYLINDERN EINES DRUCKSYSTEMS. | [2023/50] | English: | ASSEMBLY AS WELL AS USE THEREOF, CLEANING CASSETTE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING PRINTING CYLINDERS OF A PRINTING SYSTEM. | [2023/50] | French: | KIT AINSI QUE SON UTILISATION, CASSETTE DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE DE CYLINDRES D'IMPRESSION D'UN SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION. | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/52] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON DRUCKZYLINDERN | ||
Former [2019/52] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING PRINTING CYLINDERS | ||
Former [2019/52] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE CYLINDRES D'IMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 12.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24171555.6 / EP4378689 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]EP0348609 (B J TRADING KK [JP]); | [YD]US5974976 (GASPARRINI C ROBERT [US], et al); | [YD]US6284720 (OPRE JAMES E [US]); | [XI]WO0183216 (BALDWIN GRAPHIC SYSTEM INC [US]); | [XD]WO2005113243 (BBA NONWOVENS SIMPSONVILLE INC [US], et al) | Examination | EP2735446 | by applicant | EP0348609 | US5030292 | CA2039898 | US5974976 | US6284720 | WO2005113243 | DE102006039736 | WO2008035168 | EP2735446 |