EP3589874 - A TUBE STRUCTURE WITH A PROTECTED SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE STRUCTURE WITH A PROTECTED SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDBLOM, Erika Linvägen 14 818 32 Valbo / SE | 02 /
EDMARKER, Daniel Jörgen Folkersväg 4 80643 Gävle / SE | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Setréus, Ellen Alleima EMEA AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 18706273.2 | 23.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018EP54566 | Priority number, date | EP20170158579 | 28.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17158579 | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018158162 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589874 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3589874 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/02, F16L9/14, F16L9/18, G01M3/04, G01M3/18 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
F16L9/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16L55/00 (KR);
F16L9/14 (EP,KR,US);
F16L9/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16L2201/30 (EP,US);
F16L39/005 (US);
F16L58/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHSTRUKTUR MIT GESCHÜTZTEM SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHLAUCHSTRUKTUR MIT GESCHÜTZTEM SENSOR | [2020/39] | English: | A TUBE STRUCTURE WITH A PROTECTED SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE STRUCTURE WITH A PROTECTED SENSOR | [2020/02] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TUBE AVEC UN CAPTEUR PROTÉGÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE TUBE AVEC UN CAPTEUR PROTÉGÉ | [2020/02] |
Former [2020/02] | SCHLAUCHSTRUKTUR MIT EINEM GESCHÜTZTEN SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHLAUCHSTRUKTUR MIT EINEM GESCHÜTZTEN SENSOR | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 30.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2018 | AL | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | IE | 23.02.2021 | LU | 23.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 23.02.2018 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.02.2018 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | DK | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | DK | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04160335 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US5497809 (WOLF LAWRENCE W [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 54 - column 9, line 51; figures 1,6a,7a *; | [A]US2012175005 (ANDERSEN JACOB [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * columns 12-43 *; | [A]US8256469 (FELIX-HENRY ANTOINE [FR]) [A] 1-16 * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2013135244 (NAT OILWELL VARCO DENMARK IS [DK]) [A] 1-16 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line 3; figure 4 * * page 17, line 7 - page 21, line 12 * * page 26, line 24 - page 29 *; | [A]WO2014169366 (VALLOUREC TUBOS DO BRASIL S A [BR]) [A] 13,14* pages 6-15; figures 1,3 * |