EP3589672 - REACTION MIXTURES OF ISOCYANATES AND POLYOLS HAVING AN EXTENDED POT LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/02] | REACTION MIXTURES OF ISOCYANATES AND POLYOLS WITH EXTENDED POT LIFE | ||
[2021/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATNER, Mathias Lützowstraße 16h 41464 Neuss / DE | 02 /
MALEIKA, Robert Pastor-Dörr-Ring 30 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
STERN, Frank-Stefan In der Auen 65 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18706540.4 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018EP54942 | Priority number, date | EP20170158947 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17158947 | [2020/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018158318 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589672 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3589672 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/52, C08J3/22, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C08G18/80, C08K3/32, C08G18/38, C08G18/46 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C08G18/4829 (EP);
C08G18/3885 (EP,US);
C08G18/089 (US);
C08G18/4676 (EP);
C08G18/48 (US);
C08G18/52 (EP,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,US);
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
C08G18/8054 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTIONSGEMISCHE VON ISOCYANATEN UND POLYOLEN MIT VERLÄNGERTER TOPFZEIT | [2020/02] | English: | REACTION MIXTURES OF ISOCYANATES AND POLYOLS HAVING AN EXTENDED POT LIFE | [2021/31] | French: | MÉLANGE DE RÉACTION D'ISOCYANATES ET DE POLYOLES AYANT UNE DURÉE D'EMPLOI PROLONGÉE | [2021/31] |
Former [2020/02] | REACTION MIXTURES OF ISOCYANATES AND POLYOLS WITH EXTENDED POT LIFE | ||
Former [2020/02] | MÉLANGES RÉACTIONNELS D'ISOCYANATES ET DE POLYOLS AYANT UNE DURÉE DE VIE EN POT PROLONGÉE | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 02.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2018 | AL | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | IE | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | LU | 28.02.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | GB | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5962561 (TURSHANI YASSIN YUSEF [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14 * column 1, lines 10-16 * * column 8, lines 21-34 * [A] 3,4; | [X]JP2002121379 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 5,6,8-12* paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; example 1 * | by applicant | JPH07118263 | US6486361 | WO2010043392 | - Justus Liebigs Annalen der Chemie, (19490000), vol. 562, pages 75 - 136 | - L.E.ST. PIERRE, "Polyethers Part I, Polyalkylene Oxide and other Polyethers", L.E.ST. PIERRE, Norman G. Gaylord, High Polymers, Interscience Publishers, (19630000), vol. XIII, page 130 |