EP3583490 - OPERATING UNIT FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr-Hella Thermocontrol GmbH Hansastraße 40 59557 Lippstadt / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Behr-Hella Thermocontrol GmbH Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCH, Stefan Niederbergheimer Str. 89 59494 Soest / DE | 02 /
SCHWAB, Tobias Narzissenweg 15 2504 Biel / CH | 03 /
KESSLER, Jan Henning Melanchthonstraße 46 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
LANGENER, Sascha Dolberger Strasse 78a 59510 Lippborg / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2019/52] | 01 /
KIRSCH, Stefan Niederbergheimer Str. 89 59494 Soest / DE | ||
02 /
SCHWAB, Tobias Tempelhofer Straße 93a 33100 Paderborn / DE | |||
03 /
KESSLER, Jan Henning Melanchthonstraße 46 33615 Bielefeld / DE | |||
04 /
LANGENER, Sascha Dolberger Strasse 78a 59510 Lippborg / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 18706701.2 | 16.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018EP53927 | Priority number, date | DE201710103162 | 16.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017103162 | DE201710103166 | 16.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017103166 | DE201710208243 | 16.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017208243 | [2019/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018149988 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3583490 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3583490 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/043 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0436 (EP,KR,US);
B60K35/10 (KR,US);
B60K35/25 (KR,US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
G06F3/043 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENEINHEIT FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGKOMPONENTE, INSBESONDERE MENSCH-MASCHINE-INTERFACE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2019/52] | English: | OPERATING UNIT FOR A VEHICLE COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE FOR A VEHICLE | [2019/52] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR UN COMPOSANT DE VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 13.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2397933 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]); | [IA]US2013127755 (LYNN LAPOE E [US], et al); | [A]JP2016095552 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) | by applicant | EP2684111 | US9436284 | US9449476 | US9477350 |