27.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
05.03.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
02.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.02.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
27.03.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
06.03.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
03.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.11.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
18.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
03.09.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
28.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|