Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020000872 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816481663 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018214506 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | US201815884108 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210157482 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20197024611 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190112029 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6990717B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2022 | B2 | JP2020506229 | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3701965 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18707414 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110248679 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3051182 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | C | CA3051182 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018212806 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3573663 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2021 | B1 | EP3573663 | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019014192 | 11.02.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2878094T | 18.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2019127027 | 02.06.2021 | A3 | RU2019127027 | 01.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201904119 | 24.06.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB50559 | 30.01.2018 | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018138703 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762452096 | 30.01.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP3701965 |