EP3583719 - NARROWBAND TIME-DIVISION DUPLEX FRAME STRUCTURE FOR NARROWBAND COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHARAN, Arvind c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BHATTAD, Kapil c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHANDRASEKAR, Manikandan c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SOMICHETTY, Gowrisankar c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
WANG, Xiao feng c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18707805.0 | 09.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018US17620 | Priority number, date | IN201741005220 | 14.02.2017 Original published format: IN201741005220 | IN201741005360 | 15.02.2017 Original published format: IN201741005360 | US201715706966 | 18.09.2017 Original published format: US201715706966 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018152024 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3583719 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/14, H04L5/00 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/2606 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2656 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2668 (EP,KR,US);
H04J3/0682 (KR,US);
H04L1/04 (KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04L5/143 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/24 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/0005 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/008 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | SCHMALBANDIGE ZEITDUPLEX-RAHMENSTRUKTUR FÜR SCHMALBANDIGE KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2019/52] | English: | NARROWBAND TIME-DIVISION DUPLEX FRAME STRUCTURE FOR NARROWBAND COMMUNICATIONS | [2019/52] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TRAME DE DUPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS À BANDE ÉTROITE POUR COMMUNICATIONS À BANDE ÉTROITE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 31.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |