EP3576867 - DIBLOCK COPOLYMER VESICLES AND SEPARATION MEMBRANES COMPRISING AQUAPORIN WATER CHANNELS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquaporin A/S Nymøllevej 78 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPULBER, Mariana Schioldannsvej 3 1-N 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 02 /
GERSTANDT, Karen Reihe 15 25581 Poyenberg / DE | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18707854.8 | 06.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018EP52912 | Priority number, date | GB20170001945 | 06.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201701945 | EP20170052567 | 06.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17052567 | SG10201703559 | 02.05.2017 Original published format: SG 10201703559 | DK2017PA70963 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770963 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018141985 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576867 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12, B01D69/14, B01D71/56, B01D71/60, B01D71/70, B01D71/80, B01D61/02 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B01D69/144 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D61/02 (IL,RU);
B01D61/0022 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01D63/0233 (KR);
B01D63/101 (KR);
B01D67/0006 (KR);
B01D69/02 (KR,US);
B01D69/06 (KR);
B01D69/08 (KR);
B01D69/105 (KR);
B01D69/1213 (KR);
B01D69/1251 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D71/60 (IL,KR,RU);
B01D71/62 (KR);
B01D71/701 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D71/74 (KR);
B01D71/80 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,KR);
C08G77/452 (RU);
C12N11/00 (RU);
F03G7/015 (KR);
F03G7/04 (KR);
B01D2323/12 (KR);
B01D2323/216 (KR);
B01D2323/2182 (KR);
B01D2323/36 (KR);
B01D2325/38 (KR,US);
B01D71/58 (EP);
Y02A20/131 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | DIBLOCKCOPOLYMERVESIKEL UND TRENNMEMBRANEN MIT AQUAPORINWASSERKANÄLEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/50] | English: | DIBLOCK COPOLYMER VESICLES AND SEPARATION MEMBRANES COMPRISING AQUAPORIN WATER CHANNELS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEM | [2019/50] | French: | VÉSICULES COPOLYMÈRE DI-BLOC ET MEMBRANES DE SÉPARATION COMPRENANT DES CANAUX AQUEUX D'AQUAPORINE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2013043118 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG], et al); | [XP]WO2017137361 (AQUAPORIN AS [DK]); |