EP3743667 - HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE, AND HEAT EXCHANGER COMPRISING SUCH A PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques-THS ZA l'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verriere 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAND, Jean-Pierre C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS CEDEX / FR | 02 /
VALLEE, Nicolas C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS CEDEX / FR | 03 /
NAUDIN, Yoann C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 9 rue du Colonel Charbonneaux CS 60044 51721 REIMS / FR | 04 /
WASCAT, Frédéric C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 9 rue du Colonel Charbonneaux CS 60044 51721 REIMS / FR | 05 /
SAUSSET, Eddie C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 9 rue du Colonel Charbonneaux CS 60044 51721 REIMS / FR | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/49] | Neuviale, Bertrand Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA L'Agiot 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18708332.4 | 23.01.2018 | [2020/49] | WO2018EP51609 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145022 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743667 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3743667 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/007, F28D9/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
F28D9/0031 (EP,US);
F28F9/0075 (EP,US);
F28F2265/26 (EP,US);
F28F2275/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERPLATTE UND WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT SOLCH EINER PLATTE | [2020/49] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE, AND HEAT EXCHANGER COMPRISING SUCH A PLATE | [2020/49] | French: | PLAQUE POUR ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR COMPRENANT UNE TELLE PLAQUE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 28.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Request for further processing for: | 06.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.08.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4253520 (FRIEDERICY JOHAN A, et al); | [A]EP0748995 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al); | [A]EP1195573 (MODINE MFG CO [US]); | [Y]US2007261820 (ROUSSEAU TONY P [US], et al); | [YA]FR2992715 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) |