EP3592850 - PREPARING AND USE OF GLU-PLASMINOGEN FROM BLOOD FRACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PreviPharma Consulting GmbH Theodor-Kutzer-Ufer 1-3 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELZ, Ricarda Bahnhofstrasse 20 69256 Mauer / DE | 02 /
GERDING, Hanne Rieke Kolmarerstrasse 17 68229 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
MAZUR, Marc Grabengasse 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | 04 /
KIESSIG, Stephan T. Karl-Hermann-Zahn-Str. 53/2 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 05 /
KARGES, Hermann E. Sonnenweg 32 35041 Marburg / DE | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
GRUBER, Ricarda Bahnhofstrasse 20 69256 Mauer / DE | ||
02 /
GERDING, Hanne Rieke Kolmarerstrasse 17 68229 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
MAZUR, Marc Grabengasse 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
04 /
KIESSIG, Stephan T. Karl-Hermann-Zahn-Str. 53/2 69168 Wiesloch / DE | |||
05 /
KARGES, Hermann E. Sonnenweg 32 35041 Marburg / DE | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18708708.5 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018EP55984 | Priority number, date | EP20170160106 | 09.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17160106 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018162754 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3592850 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/68, C07K1/18, A61K38/48 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
C12N9/6435 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/484 (EP,KR,US);
C12P21/00 (US);
C12Y304/21007 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON GLU-PLASMINOGEN AUS BLUTFRAKTIONEN | [2020/03] | English: | PREPARING AND USE OF GLU-PLASMINOGEN FROM BLOOD FRACTIONS | [2020/03] | French: | PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DE GLU-PLASMINOGÈNE DE FRACTIONS SANGUINES | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 02.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1305504 ; | [I]US5288489 (REICH EDWARD [US], et al); | [XI]WO02095019 (OMRIX BIOPHARM SA [BE]); | by applicant | GB1305504 | US5288489 | WO02095019 |