EP3585880 - EXPANSION OF POPULATIONS OF T CELLS BY THE USE OF MODIFIED SERUM FREE MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation IP Legal Department 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | For all designated states The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104-6283 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARELA-ROHENA, Angel, M. Legal Department Intellectual Property 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | 02 /
ANDOLINA, Melanie, B. Legal Department Intellectual Property 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | 03 /
RILEY, James, L. 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia PA 19104-6283 / US | 04 /
MEDVEC, Andrew 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia PA 19104-6283 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18710264.5 | 26.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018US19750 | Priority number, date | US201762464233P | 27.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762464233 P | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157072 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585880 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0783 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
A61K2239/46 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,US);
C12N5/0031 (EP,US);
C12N5/0637 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C07K2319/03 (EP);
C12N2500/34 (EP,US);
C12N2500/36 (US);
C12N2500/99 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | EXPANSION VON POPULATIONEN VON T-ZELLEN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEN SERUMFREIEN MEDIEN | [2020/01] | English: | EXPANSION OF POPULATIONS OF T CELLS BY THE USE OF MODIFIED SERUM FREE MEDIA | [2020/01] | French: | EXPANSION DE POPULATIONS DE LYMPHOCYTES T PAR L'UTILISATION DE MILIEUX SANS SÉRUM MODIFIÉS | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 27.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | FR901228 | US5399346 | US5580859 | US5589466 | WO0129058 | US6326193 | WO0196584 | US8906682 | US9119807 |