EP3606835 - MULTIPLE PLY BAG AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTIPLE PLY BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/07] | MULTIPLE PLY BAG | ||
[2023/25] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dy-pack Verpackungen Gustav Dyckerhoff GmbH Im Ruttenberge 1 57482 Wenden-Gerlingen / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LISEK, Eduard Fontanestraße 15 57489 Drolshagen / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Gerhard Pollender Straße 16 51789 Lindlar-Frielingsdorf / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Veit Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18710375.9 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018EP54937 | Priority number, date | DE20171004268 | 03.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017004268 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202340 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606835 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606835 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/00, B65D23/00, // B65D30/08, B65D30/18, B65D30/24, B31B70/10, B31B70/16, B31B70/26, B31B150/00, B31B160/20, B31B170/20 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B65D31/04 (EP);
B31B70/10 (EP);
B31B70/16 (EP);
B31B70/262 (EP);
B65D31/08 (EP);
B65D31/142 (EP);
B31B2150/003 (EP);
B31B2160/20 (EP);
B31B2170/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | B65D30/08, B65D30/18, B65D30/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGER SACK UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRLAGIGEN SACKES | [2023/25] | English: | MULTIPLE PLY BAG AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTIPLE PLY BAG | [2023/25] | French: | SAC MULTI-COUCHES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SAC MULTI-COUCHES | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/07] | MEHRLAGIGER SACK | ||
Former [2020/07] | MULTIPLE PLY BAG | ||
Former [2020/07] | SAC MULTICOUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH339804 (ST REGIS PAPER CO [US]); | [XI]FR2028049 (CRAFSAC); | [XI]DE2360142 (BISCHOF & KLEIN) | Examination | DE357123 | FR1073031 | by applicant | DE202014000194U |